Global patent index - EP 1026880 A1

EP 1026880 A1 2000-08-09 - Array readout system

Title (en)

Array readout system

Title (de)

Matrixlesesystem

Title (fr)

Système de lecture de réseaux

Publication

EP 1026880 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300583 A

Priority

US 24436399 A

Abstract (en)

Problems with source followers employed in active arrays are alleviated by employing a differential amplifier for each element of the active array. However, instead of including an entire differential amplifier within each element, part of the differential amplifier structure is shared among each sensor element connected to a particular column. For example, the differential amplifier may be a differential pair operational transconductance amplifier (OTA) which is connected using a feedback configuration. However, instead of including an OTA within each sensor element of the array, part of the OTA structure is shared among each sensor element connected to a particular column. Although gains greater than one are achievable by employing the differential amplifier with a feedback network, to avoid introducing fixed pattern noise, substantially unity gain is often preferred. Furthermore, the shared differential amplifier model of array reading may be employed for any active array readout application, e.g., including arrays that are not in themselves per se sensor arrays, where the necessary structure to form the shared differential amplifier is included within the elements of the array. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 3/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 27/04 (2006.01); H04N 5/335 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 3/155 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1026880 A1 20000809; JP 2000228100 A 20000815; JP 5661224 B2 20150128; US 6677995 B1 20040113

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-17 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04N0003150000

- IPC: H04N0005378000

2015-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140815

2013-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2013-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-09-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071005

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI