Global Patent Index - EP 1026919 A2

EP 1026919 A2 2000-08-09 - Loudspeaker with connection without soldering

Title (en)

Loudspeaker with connection without soldering

Title (de)

Lautsprecher mit lötfreiem Anschluss

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur avec connection sans soudure

Publication

EP 1026919 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121845 A

Priority

DE 19903823 A

Abstract (en)

The loudspeaker comprises a loudspeaker basket, at which a loudspeaker membrane is fastened, and a driving system with at least two connecting wires (54). A connection arrangement (10) for an electric cable is provided, comprising two isolated holder devices formed on a main body (7), each for recording a corresponding connecting wire. The connection arrangement includes concisely working anchorage devices (12, 13) for the multi-pole connection cable, connecting the loudspeaker with an electronic arrangement, and pressure devices for holding the connection cable. An Independent claim is provided for a corresponding connecting method of the loudspeaker.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Lautsprecher sind zwei voneinander isolierte Haltemittel in Gestalt von Klemmkerben vorgesehen, um von der Lautsprechermembrane abgehende Anschlusslitzen reibschlüssig festzuhalten. Die Haltemittel können gleichzeitig so weitergebildet sein, dass die Anschlusslitzen flach auf eine Andruckfläche aufliegen. Ein zum Anschluss vorgesehenes Flachbandkabel trägt auf derselben Seite parallel nebeneinander zwei ansonsten voneinander isolierte Leiterbahnen. Mit Hilfe eines Andruckmittels wird das Anschlusskabel gegen die umgebogenen Abschnitte der Anschlusslitzen angepresst. Durch das Flachbandkabel hindurchgreifende Zapfen verhindern, dass das Anschlusskabel unter dem Andruckmittel hervorgezogen werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01); H04R 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/06 (2013.01); H04R 9/06 (2013.01); H04R 2499/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19903823 A1 20000803; DE 19903823 B4 20100415; EP 1026919 A2 20000809; EP 1026919 A3 20060405

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090806

2007-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 1/00 20060101AFI20000513BHEP

2006-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 31/00 20060101ALI20060216BHEP

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI