Global patent index - EP 1026983 A2

EP 1026983 A2 2000-08-16 - MULTISPECTRAL/HYPERSPECTRAL MEDICAL INSTRUMENT

Title (en)

MULTISPECTRAL/HYPERSPECTRAL MEDICAL INSTRUMENT

Title (de)

MULTISPEKTRALES/HYPERSPEKTRALES MEDIZINISCHES INSTRUMENT

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT MEDICAL MULTISPECTRAL/HYPERSPECTRAL

Publication

EP 1026983 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98956323 A

Priority

  • US 9822961 W
  • US 96129497 A
  • US 9304197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922640A2] A medical instrument that comprises: a first-stage optic responsive to a tissue surface of a patient; a spectral separator optically responsive to the first stage optic and having a control input; an imaging sensor optically responsive to the spectral separator and having an image data output; and a diagnostic processor having an image acquisition interface with an input responsive to the imaging sensor and a filter control interface having a control output provided to the control input of the spectral separator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/00 (2006.01); A61B 1/00 (2006.01); A61B 1/05 (2006.01); A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 1/00039 (2013.01); A61B 1/05 (2013.01); A61B 5/0075 (2013.01); A61B 5/0084 (2013.01); A61B 5/0088 (2013.01); A61B 5/1455 (2013.01); A61B 90/36 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922640A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922640 A2 19990514; WO 9922640 A3 19990819; AU 1287499 A 19990524; AU 751456 B2 20020815; CA 2308375 A1 19990514; CA 2308375 C 20130409; EP 1026983 A2 20000816; JP 2001521772 A 20011113; JP 2011036695 A 20110224; JP 5174877 B2 20130403

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20101015

2010-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT AS REPRESENTED BY THE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2010-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING, INC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030918

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENTAS REPRESENTED BYTHE D

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYPERMED, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030918

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEWIS, EDGAR, N.

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FREEMAN, JENNY, E.

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE