Global Patent Index - EP 1026988 A1

EP 1026988 A1 2000-08-16 - FLUORESCENT REPORTER MOLECULES AND THEIR APPLICATIONS INCLUDING ASSAYS FOR CASPASES

Title (en)

FLUORESCENT REPORTER MOLECULES AND THEIR APPLICATIONS INCLUDING ASSAYS FOR CASPASES

Title (de)

FLUORESZIERENDE ANZEIGE MOLOKÜLE UND ANWENDUNGEN EINSCHLIESSLICH CASPASEDOSIERUNG

Title (fr)

MOLECULES REPORTERS FLUORESCENTES, APPLICATIONS DE CES MOLECULES ET DOSAGES DES CASPASES

Publication

EP 1026988 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953317 A

Priority

  • US 9821231 W
  • US 6158297 P
  • US 3366198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918856A1] The present invention relates to novel fluorescent dyes, novel fluorogenic and fluorescent reporter molecules and new enzyme assay processes that can be used to detect the activity of caspases and other enzymes involved in apoptosis in whole cells, cell lines and tissue samples derived from any living organism or organ. The reporter molecules and assay processes can be used in drug screening procedures to identify compounds which act as inhibitors or inducers of the caspase cascade in whole cells or tissues. The reagents and assays described herein are also useful for determining the chemosensitivity of human cancer cells to treatment with chemotherapeutic drugs. The present invention also relates to novel fluorogenic and fluorescent reporter molecules and new enzyme assay processes that can be used to detect the activity of type 2 methionine aminopeptidase, dipeptidyl peptidase IV, calpain, aminopeptidase, HIV protease, adenovirus protease, HSV-1 protease, HCMV protease and HCV protease.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 8/00; C12P 17/06; C12Q 1/00; C12Q 1/37; C12Q 1/70; G01N 33/48; G01N 33/574; G01N 33/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C07K 1/13 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/062 (2006.01); C07K 5/083 (2006.01); C07K 5/10 (2006.01); C07K 5/103 (2006.01); C07K 5/107 (2006.01); C07K 5/113 (2006.01); C12P 17/06 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01); G01N 15/14 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/533 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); G01N 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/06026 (2013.01); C07K 5/06052 (2013.01); C07K 5/0806 (2013.01); C07K 5/0808 (2013.01); C07K 5/101 (2013.01); C07K 5/1013 (2013.01); C07K 5/1016 (2013.01); C07K 5/1021 (2013.01); C12Q 1/68 (2013.01); G01N 15/1456 (2013.01); G01N 33/533 (2013.01); G01N 2015/1006 (2013.01); G01N 2015/1488 (2013.01); Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918856 A1 19990422; AU 1072299 A 19990503; AU 754634 B2 20021121; BR 9814816 A 20040622; CA 2308125 A1 19990422; CN 1281346 A 20010124; EA 200000408 A1 20001225; EP 1026988 A1 20000816; EP 1026988 A4 20050330; HU 0100079 A2 20010528; IL 135365 D0 20010520; IS 5414 A 20000324; JP 2001519368 A 20011023; NO 20001322 A 20000613; NO 20001322 D0 20000314; NZ 503619 A 20011130; PL 341661 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FLUORESCENT REPORTER MOLECULES AND THEIR APPLICATIONS INCLUDING ASSAYS FOR CASPASES

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBER, ECKARD

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAI, SUI, XIONG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEANA, JOHN, F., W.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREWE, JOHN, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHANG, HAN-ZHONG

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070320

2005-03-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 8/00 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/70 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/48 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/574 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 17/06 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/58 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/37 B

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBER, ECKARD

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAI, SUI, XIONG

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEANA, JOHN, F., W.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREWE, JOHN, A.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHANG, HAN-ZHONG

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000508;LT PAYMENT 20000508;LV PAYMENT 20000508;MK PAYMENT 20000508;RO PAYMENT 20000508;SI PAYMENT 20000508