Global patent index - EP 1027049 A1

EP 1027049 A1 2000-08-16 - INTRANASAL FORMULATION CONTAINING SCOPOLAMINE AND METHOD OF TREATING MOTION SICKNESS

Title (en)

INTRANASAL FORMULATION CONTAINING SCOPOLAMINE AND METHOD OF TREATING MOTION SICKNESS

Title (de)

INTRANASALE FORMULIERUNG ENTHALTEND SCOPOLAMIN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON REISEKRANKHEIT

Title (fr)

FORMULATION INTRANASALE CONTENANT DE LA SCOPOLAMINE ET METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU MAL DES TRANSPORTS

Publication

EP 1027049 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946945 A

Priority

  • US 9818953 W
  • US 5865197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912544A1] The present invention relates to pharmaceutical formulations containing scopolamine. More particularly, the invention relates to an intranasal gel formulation including scopolamine hydrobromide in a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier, most preferably an intranasal gel, at a pH at or below about 4.0, preferably at or below about 3.5, and a salt concentration below about 200 mM, with the gel solution incorporating polyvinylalcohol as a gelling agent. The intranasal formulations are particularly useful for preventing and/or treating nausea and/or vomiting associated with, for example, motion sickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/439 (2006.01); A61K 31/46 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61P 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/32 (2013.01); A61K 9/0043 (2013.01); A61K 31/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912544 A1 19990318; AU 742878 B2 20020117; AU 9385098 A 19990329; CA 2303132 A1 19990318; CA 2303132 C 20020709; EP 1027049 A1 20000816; EP 1027049 A4 20010905; JP 2002516815 A 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20051102

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASTECH PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-09-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE