Global Patent Index - EP 1027054 A4

EP 1027054 A4 2002-11-04 - LOCAL ADMINISTRATION OF PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION

Title (en)

LOCAL ADMINISTRATION OF PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION

Title (de)

LOKALE ANWENDUNG VON PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER EREKTILEN DYSFUNKTION

Title (fr)

APPORT LOCAL D'INHIBITEURS DE PHOSPHODIESTERASES, DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU DYSFONCTIONNEMENT ERECTILE

Publication

EP 1027054 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98954032 A

Priority

  • US 95881697 A
  • US 18107098 A
  • US 9822928 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921558A2] A method is provided for treating erectile dysfunction in a mammalian male individual. The method involves the local administration of a phosphodiesterase inhibitor or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt, ester, amide or derivative thereof, within the context of an effective dosing regimen. A preferred mode of administration is transurethral. Pharmaceutical formulations and kits are provided as well.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/485; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/50; A61K 31/505

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/343 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/4015 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/4166 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/4704 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/4745 (2006.01); A61K 31/485 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/501 (2006.01); A61K 31/502 (2006.01); A61K 31/5025 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/538 (2006.01); A61K 31/549 (2006.01); A61K 31/5513 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 9/0034 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/343 (2013.01); A61K 31/381 (2013.01); A61K 31/4015 (2013.01); A61K 31/4164 (2013.01); A61K 31/4166 (2013.01); A61K 31/426 (2013.01); A61K 31/437 (2013.01); A61K 31/4439 (2013.01); A61K 31/444 (2013.01); A61K 31/4704 (2013.01); A61K 31/4709 (2013.01); A61K 31/4745 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); A61K 31/50 (2013.01); A61K 31/501 (2013.01); A61K 31/502 (2013.01); A61K 31/5025 (2013.01); A61K 31/519 (2013.01); A61K 31/52 (2013.01); A61K 31/522 (2013.01); A61K 31/538 (2013.01); A61K 31/549 (2013.01); A61K 31/5513 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9819672 A1 19980514 - NITROMED INC [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9822453 A1 19980528 - BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE], et al
  • [E] WO 9921562 A1 19990506 - VIVUS INC [US]
  • [DX] WO 9428902 A1 19941222 - PFIZER LTD [GB], et al
  • [DX] WO 9616644 A1 19960606 - PFIZER LTD [GB], et al
  • [X] BOOLELL, M., ET AL.: "Sildenafil, a novel effective oral therapy for male erectile dysfunction", BRITISH JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, vol. 78, no. 2, 1996, pages 257 - 261, XP000853934
  • [X] STIEF C G (REPRINT) ET AL: "Selective pharmacological manipulation of the smooth muscle tissues of th genitourinary tract: Experimental and clinical studies", AKTUELLE UROLOGIE, ( MAR 1997 ) VOL. 28, NO. 2, PP. 76-87. PUBLISHER: GEORG THIEME VERLAG, P O BOX 30 11 20, D-70451 STUTTGART, GERMANY. ISSN: 0001-7868., HANNOVER MED SCH, UROL KLIN, D-30623 HANNOVER, GERMANY (Reprint), XP008004658
  • [X] TAHER A ET AL: "Cyclic nucleotide phosphodiesterase in human cavernous smooth muscle.", WORLD JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, vol. 15, no. 1, 1997, pages 32 - 35, XP001021795, ISSN: 0724-4983
  • [Y] SPARWASSER C ET AL: "Smooth muscle tone regulation in rabbit cavernosal and spongiosal tissue by cyclic AMP- and cyclic GMP-dependent mechanisms.", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, vol. 152, no. 6 PART 1, 1994, pages 2159 - 2163, XP000604575, ISSN: 0022-5347
  • [Y] STIEF C G (REPRINT) ET AL: "PHOSPHODIESTERASE ISOENZYMES OF THE HUMAN CAVERNOUS TISSUE AND ITS FUNCTIONAL-SIGNIFICANCE", AKTUELLE UROLOGIE, ( SEP 1995 ) VOL. 26, SP. ISS. 1, PP. 22-24. ISSN: 0001-7868., HANNOVER MED SCH, UROL KLIN, D-30623 HANNOVER, GERMANY (Reprint), XP008004657
  • [X] DERRY F ET AL: "SILDENAFIL (VIAGRA TM): A DOUBLE-BLIND, PLACEBO-CONTROLLED, SINGLE-DOSE, TWO-WAY CROSSOVER STUDY IN MEN WITH ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION CAUSED BY TRAUMATIC SPINAL CORD INJURY", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 157, no. SUPPL 4, 1997, pages 181, XP000921337, ISSN: 0022-5347
  • [X] JEREMY J Y ET AL: "Effects of sildenafil, a type-5 cGMP phosphodiesterase inhibitor, and papaverine on cyclic GMP and cyclic AMP levels in the rabbit corpus cavernosum in vitro", BJU. BRITISH JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, J & C EDICIONES MEDICAS, ESPLUGUES DE LLOBREGAT, ES, vol. 79, 1997, pages 958 - 963, XP002090615, ISSN: 1139-4757
  • [PX] TRUSS MICHAEL C ET AL: "Phosphodiesterase inhibitors in the treatment of erectile dysfunction.", DRUGS OF TODAY, vol. 34, no. 9, 1998, pages 805 - 812, XP000885894, ISSN: 0025-7656
  • See also references of WO 9921558A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921558 A2 19990506; WO 9921558 A3 20001026; AU 1125499 A 19990517; AU 734734 B2 20010621; CA 2305394 A1 19990506; CA 2305394 C 20061212; EP 1027054 A1 20000816; EP 1027054 A4 20021104; JP 2003525845 A 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070114

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOHERTY, PAUL, C., JR.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLACE, VIRGIL, A.

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMITH, WILLIAM, L.

2002-12-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIVUS, INC.

2002-11-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/485 A, 7A 61K 31/47 B, 7A 61K 31/50 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B

2001-01-03 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-01-03 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Inventor name: PLACE, VIRGIL, A.

2001-01-03 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Inventor name: SMITH, WILLIAM, L.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOHERTY, PAUL, C., JR.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLACE, VIRGIL, A.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMITH, WILLIAM, L.

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE