Global Patent Index - EP 1027097 A1

EP 1027097 A1 2000-08-16 - INTRAVASCULAR METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ISOLATION AND SELECTIVE COOLING OF THE CEREBRAL VASCULATURE DURING SURGICAL PROCEDURES

Title (en)

INTRAVASCULAR METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ISOLATION AND SELECTIVE COOLING OF THE CEREBRAL VASCULATURE DURING SURGICAL PROCEDURES

Title (de)

METHODE UND GERÄTE ZUR ISOLIERUNG UND KÜHLUNG VON CEREBRALEN GEFÄSSEN WÄHREND CHIRURGISCHEN EINGRIFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET APPAREIL INTRAVASCULAIRES PERMETTANT D'ISOLER ET DE REFROIDIR SELECTIVEMENT LE SYSTEME VASCULAIRE AU COURS D'INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES

Publication

EP 1027097 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909663 A

Priority

  • US 9904345 W
  • US 9621898 P
  • US 25696599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0009200A1] Patients having diminished circulation in the cerebral vasculature as a result of stroke or from other causes such as cardiac arrest, shock or head trauma, or aneurysm surgery or aortic surgery, are treated by flowing an oxygenated medium through an arterial access site into the cerebral vasculature and collecting the medium through an access site in the venous site of the cerebral vasculature. Usually, the cold oxygenated medium will comprise autologous blood, and the blood will be recirculated for a time sufficient to permit treatment of the underlying cause of diminished circulation. In addition to oxygenation, the recirculating blood will also be cooled to hypothermically treat to preserve brain tissue. Isolation and cooling of cerebral vasculature in patients undergoing aortic as well as other procedures is achieved by internally occluding at least the right common carotid artery above the aortic arch, and perfusing blood into the arterial cerebral vasculature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/3621 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0009200 A1 20000224; AU 2882099 A 20000306; EP 1027097 A1 20000816; EP 1027097 A4 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2001-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 37/00 A, 7A 61M 1/36 B, 7A 61B 17/12 B, 7A 61M 25/10 B

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT