Global Patent Index - EP 1027109 A1

EP 1027109 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD FOR REDUCTIVE DEHALOGENATION OF HALOGEN-ORGANIC SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REDUCTIVE DEHALOGENATION OF HALOGEN-ORGANIC SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTIVEN DEHALOGENIERUNG VON HALOGENORGANISCHEN STOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DESHALOGENATION REDUCTRICE DE SUBSTANCES HALOGENO-ORGANIQUES

Publication

EP 1027109 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954202 A

Priority

  • DE 9802787 W
  • DE 19742297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742297A1] The invention relates to a method for reductive dehalogenation of halogen-organic substances which can be used in solid or liquid mixtures of substances. When the parameters of the inventive method are correspondingly adapted, liquids and halogen-organic contaminated soils can be mechanically treated and consequently reductively dehalogenated by applying mechanical energy and adding elementary alkali metal, earth-alkaline metal, aluminum or iron as a reducing agent and at least one reactant with slightly activated hydrogen as a hydrogen source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/34 (2007.01); A62D 3/37 (2007.01); B09C 1/02 (2006.01); B09C 1/08 (2006.01); C07B 35/06 (2006.01); C07B 37/06 (2006.01); A62D 101/22 (2007.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 3/37 (2013.01); A62D 3/34 (2013.01); A62D 2101/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915239A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742297 A1 19990401; DE 19742297 C2 20000629; AT 226466 T 20021115; AU 1143299 A 19990412; AU 758391 B2 20030320; CA 2304802 A1 19990401; DK 1027109 T3 20030310; EP 1027109 A1 20000816; EP 1027109 B1 20021023; ES 2186237 T3 20030501; JP 2001517641 A 20011009; PT 1027109 E 20030331; US 6382537 B1 20020507; WO 9915239 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BIRKE VOLKER

- Effective date: 20040930

2006-04-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-09-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-05-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040919

2005-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BIRKE VOLKER

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040919

2004-09-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040919

2003-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DCR INTERNATIONAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES B.V.

2003-09-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DCR INTERNATIONAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES B.V.

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030825

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030821

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-13 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030811

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186237 T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400231

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806075 20021128

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226466 T 20021115

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011218

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE