Global Patent Index - EP 1027135 A1

EP 1027135 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING OXYGEN FROM A GAS MIXTURE CONTAINING IT AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SEPARATING OXYGEN FROM A GAS MIXTURE CONTAINING IT AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON SAVERSTOFF AUS EINEM SOLCHEM ENTHALTENDEN GAMISCHUNGUND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE L'OXYGENE D'UN MELANGE DE GAZ LE CONTENANT ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1027135 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98952804 A

Priority

  • FR 9802306 W
  • FR 9713568 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770149A1] A solid electrolyte oxygen separation cell contains a homogeneous structure of one or more BIMEVOX (RTM) derivatives (substituted Bi4V2O11 derivatives as described in WO 9101274) and self-adapting reversible in-situ dynamically created electrodes. Oxygen is separated from a gas mixture using a solid electrolyte electrochemical cell comprising the above described homogeneous structure and current collectors. An Independent claim is also included for an electrochemical cell for carrying out the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/32; C01B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 3/3418 (2006.01); B01D 53/32 (2006.01); C01B 13/02 (2006.01); C25B 9/06 (2006.01); C25B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/326 (2013.01); A23L 3/3418 (2013.01); C01B 13/0233 (2013.01); B01D 2257/104 (2013.01); C01B 2210/0046 (2013.01); C01B 2210/0062 (2013.01); C01B 2210/0071 (2013.01); C01B 2210/0075 (2013.01); C01B 2210/0082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921642A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770149 A1 19990430; FR 2770149 B1 19991217; CN 1278191 A 20001227; EP 1027135 A1 20000816; IL 135815 D0 20010520; JP 2001520929 A 20011106; US 6143162 A 20001107; WO 9921642 A1 19990506; ZA 9809843 B 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011212

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOIVIN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEL GALLO, PASCAL

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOULETIER, JACQUES

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEITZ, MICHEL

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LABRUNE, PHILIPPE

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAGRANGE, GILLES

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAIRESSE, GA(TAN

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOWOGROCKI, GUY

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOIVIN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEL GALLO, PASCAL

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOULETIER, JACQUES

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEITZ, MICHEL

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LABRUNE, PHILIPPE

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAGRANGE, GILLES

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAIRESSE, GA(TAN

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOWOGROCKI, GUY

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOIVIN, JEAN-CLAUDE

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEL GALLO, PASCAL

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOULETIER, JACQUES

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEITZ, MICHEL

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LABRUNE, PHILIPPE

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAGRANGE, GILLES

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAIRESSE, GA(TAN

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOWOGROCKI, GUY

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE