Global patent index - EP 1027141 A1

EP 1027141 A1 2000-08-16 - REACTOR MIXING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD

Title (en)

REACTOR MIXING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSTELLUNG AUS REAKTOR UND MISCHER UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE REACTEUR MELANGEUR ET MÉTHODE

Publication

EP 1027141 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924882 A

Priority

  • US 9810659 W
  • US 94257597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916539A1] A continuous dynamic mixing assembly (61) includes a mixing chamber (16) having an inner wall which is generally symmetrical about a central axis. At least one first fluid inlet (18) introduces first fluid material into the mixing chamber (16). At least one second fluid inlet (22) introduces second fluid material into the mixing chamber (16). At least one outlet (20) permits fluid to leave the mixing chamber (16). First baffles (24) extend along the inner wall generally parallel to the axis for disrupting fluid flow generally circumferentially in the mixing chamber (16). Second baffles (26) extend generally transverse to the axis for disrupting fluid flow generally axially in the mixing chamber (16). A rotatable agitator (30) includes a cylindrical central portion (32) extending in the mixing chamber (16) along the axis and has at least one blade (34) having a twisted orientation on the central portion (32). A relative arrangement among the baffles (24, 26) and the agitator (30) enable residence time of fluid in the reactor to be selectively adjusted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/16; B01F 7/08; B01F 7/24; B01F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/08 (2006.01); D21C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 11/0057 (2013.01); B01F 7/086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916539 A1 19990408; AU 7695098 A 19990423; EP 1027141 A1 20000816; EP 1027141 A4 20040407; EP 1027141 B1 20060726

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080526

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-05-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI FR SE

2006-02-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: REACTOR MIXING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-04-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 01F 7/16 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 01F 7/08 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 01F 7/24 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 01F 15/00 B

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YANT, ROBERT

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PIECHUTA, PIOTR

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BUTLER, KEVIN

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PIECHUTA, MARK

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI FR SE