Global Patent Index - EP 1027165 A2

EP 1027165 A2 2000-08-16 - APPLICATION METHOD FOR AT LEAST TWO DIFFERENT MEDIA AND DISPENSER THEREFOR

Title (en)

APPLICATION METHOD FOR AT LEAST TWO DIFFERENT MEDIA AND DISPENSER THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUSBRINGEN VON WENIGSTENS ZWEI VERSCHIEDENEN MEDIEN UND SPENDER DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER AU MOINS DEUX PRODUITS DIFFERENTS ET DISTRIBUTEUR A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 1027165 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98952735 A

Priority

  • DE 19749513 A
  • DE 19749514 A
  • DE 19837127 A
  • EP 9806712 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6626379B1] In order to enable application of a dry i.e. powdery or granulated active substance, said substance is kept apart from a liquid supply in a dispenser. The powder is discharged with the help of said liquid during application. The liquid serves as a carrier for the active substance and is mixed with the liquid to varying degrees prior to discharge. The dispenser (11) has a liquid chamber (21) in an ampoule (19) which is provided with a closure stopper (26) which can be pierced. The liquid flow which is released upon actuation penetrates into a medium storage chamber (43), is mixed with the medium (51) therein and exits via an opened discharge outlet (44) in the form of a spray mist, jet or drop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0078 (2013.01); B05B 11/02 (2013.01); B05B 7/2405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924171A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6626379 B1 20030930; AU 1031699 A 19990531; AU 2047599 A 19990531; CA 2307160 A1 19990520; CA 2307160 C 20090505; DE 19749514 A1 19990512; DE 19837127 A1 19990512; DE 59804744 D1 20020814; DE 59807579 D1 20030424; DE 59811482 D1 20040701; DK 1027165 T3 20030721; DK 1297898 T3 20041004; EP 1027165 A2 20000816; EP 1027165 B1 20030319; EP 1027166 A1 20000816; EP 1027166 B1 20020710; EP 1297898 A2 20030402; EP 1297898 A3 20030409; EP 1297898 B1 20040526; ES 2194360 T3 20031116; ES 2222430 T3 20050201; JP 2001522717 A 20011120; JP 2006081917 A 20060330; JP 4411374 B2 20100210; JP 4789089 B2 20111005; WO 9924170 A1 19990520; WO 9924171 A2 19990520; WO 9924171 A3 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807579

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR RADOLFZELL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ING. ERICH PFEIFFER GMBH, 78315 RADOLFZELL, DE

- Document: DE 59807579

- Effective date: 20121025

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807579

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20121025

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101023

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ERICH *PFEIFFER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ING. ERICH PFEIFFER GMBH

- Free text: ING. ERICH PFEIFFER GMBH#OESCHLESTRASSE 124-126#78315 RADOLFZELL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ING. ERICH PFEIFFER GMBH#OESCHLESTRASSE 124-126#78315 RADOLFZELL (DE)

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194360 T3

2003-07-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807579 P 20030424

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE