Global Patent Index - EP 1027170 A1

EP 1027170 A1 2000-08-16 - PRETREATMENT BEFORE PAINTING OF COMPOSITE METAL STRUCTURES CONTAINING ALUMINUM PORTIONS

Title (en)

PRETREATMENT BEFORE PAINTING OF COMPOSITE METAL STRUCTURES CONTAINING ALUMINUM PORTIONS

Title (de)

VORBEHANDLUNG ZUM FÄRBEN VON KOMPOSITMATERIALIEN, DIE ALUMINIUMTEILE ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

PRETRAITEMENT AVANT PEINTURE DE STRUCTURES DE METAL COMPOSITE RENFERMANT DES PORTIONS D'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 1027170 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946801 A

Priority

  • US 9818001 W
  • US 5848197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912661A1] In a process for the chemical pretreatment before painting of composite metal structures that contain aluminum or aluminum alloy portions together with steel, galvanized steel and/or alloy-galvanized steel portions, in a first step the metal structure is treated with a zinc phosphating solution that forms a surface-covering crystalline zinc phosphate layer on steel and on galvanized or alloy-galvanized steel, but without forming a zinc phosphate layer on the aluminum portions, and then in a second step the metal structure is brought into contact with a treatment solution that does not excessively dissolve the crystalline zinc phosphate layer on steel, galvanized and/or alloy-galvanized steel, but forms a conversion layer on the aluminum portions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/00; B05D 1/18; B05D 3/02; C23C 22/00; C23C 22/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/10 (2006.01); C23C 22/12 (2006.01); C23C 22/17 (2006.01); C23C 22/18 (2006.01); C23C 22/73 (2006.01); C23C 22/83 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/73 (2013.01); C23C 22/12 (2013.01); C23C 22/184 (2013.01); C23C 22/83 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912661 A1 19990318; AU 756876 B2 20030123; AU 9373898 A 19990329; BR 9812069 A 20000926; CA 2303183 A1 19990318; CA 2303183 C 20090901; CN 1157263 C 20040714; CN 1274305 A 20001122; DE 69840270 C5 20120802; DE 69840270 D1 20090108; EP 1027170 A1 20000816; EP 1027170 A4 20060816; EP 1027170 B1 20081126; ES 2316169 T3 20090401; JP 2001515959 A 20010925; PL 339252 A1 20001204; TR 200000657 T2 20000721; ZA 9808202 B 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-02 [REG DE R050] EXAMING DIVISION/FEDERAL PATENT COURT DECISION LIMITING PATENT NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69840270

- Effective date: 20120612

2012-08-02 [REG DE R206] AMENDED PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: DE 69840270

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-06-12 [REG DE R050] EXAMING DIVISION/FEDERAL PATENT COURT DECISION LIMITING PATENT NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69840270

2012-01-19 [REG DE R046] LIMITATION REQUEST VALIDLY FILED

- Document: DE 69840270

- Effective date: 20111124

2011-06-22 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20101214

2009-10-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CHEMETALL GMBH

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-05-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2316169 T3

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840270 P 20090108

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070904

2006-08-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060713

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL