Global Patent Index - EP 1027195 A1

EP 1027195 A1 2000-08-16 - RAZOR WITH SOUND INDICATOR SIGNALLING FIRST USE

Title (en)

RAZOR WITH SOUND INDICATOR SIGNALLING FIRST USE

Title (de)

RASIERER MIT SCHALLERZEUGENDER ERSTBENUTZUNGSANZEIGE

Title (fr)

RASOIR A TEMOIN SONORE DE PREMIER USAGE

Publication

EP 1027195 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98952808 A

Priority

  • FR 9802311 W
  • FR 9713738 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770170A1] The razor (1) is fitted with a protective cap (4), which removably fits over the shaving head (2). The cap protects the cutting blades (3), before and after use. The shaving head is formed with a projecting lip (6), which can be broken, when the protective cap is first removed from the shaving head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/40; B26B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/00 (2006.01); B26B 21/40 (2006.01); B26B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/4037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921690A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770170 A1 19990430; FR 2770170 B1 20000114; AU 1037199 A 19990517; AU 737905 B2 20010906; BR 9813270 A 20000822; CA 2307136 A1 19990506; CN 1106248 C 20030423; CN 1278203 A 20001227; DE 69803406 D1 20020228; DE 69803406 T2 20021024; EP 1027195 A1 20000816; EP 1027195 B1 20020102; ES 2171043 T3 20020816; JP 2001520925 A 20011106; MX PA00004050 A 20020621; NZ 504176 A 20011221; PL 188263 B1 20050131; PL 340250 A1 20010129; RU 2193964 C2 20021210; US 6539633 B1 20030401; WO 9921690 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071028

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061030

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061030

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401119

2002-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171043 T3

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803406 20020228

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT SE