Global Patent Index - EP 1027245 B1

EP 1027245 B1 2001-12-19 - RAIL VEHICLE SYSTEM

Title (en)

RAIL VEHICLE SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHIENENFAHRZEUGSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE VEHICULE SUR RAIL

Publication

EP 1027245 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956898 A

Priority

  • DE 19748732 A
  • DE 19819094 A
  • EP 9806886 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6474242B1] A rail vehicle system that has connecting bogies, supply units, control units, and transportation units, which can be placed on said connecting bogies in order to form a train with a modular construction. The connecting bogies contain at least two axles, one of which is equipped with an electrical drive/brake unit, and which are configured to be separable. The supply units may contain vital devices such as current collectors, transformers and power converters for extracting power form a contact line and feeding it back into the contact line or converters of primary energy into electrical energy. The control units can be configured to be independent of current and load. The transportation units may differ according to whether they are for transporting passengers or goods and according to the type of good being transported. The interfaces of all of the units are uniform and are configured in such a way that the units can be interchanged quickly and easily. The resulting consistent division of train into functional units enables the driving power to be better adapted to the load, creates possibilities for generating and using energy and reduces operating/maintenance costs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 3/12; B61C 3/00; B61D 3/10; B61D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 3/00 (2006.01); B61D 3/10 (2006.01); B61D 3/12 (2006.01); B61F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 3/00 (2013.01); B61D 3/10 (2013.01); B61D 3/12 (2013.01); B61F 3/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6474242 B1 20021105; AT 211090 T 20020115; AU 1337399 A 19990531; AU 740384 B2 20011101; DK 1027245 T3 20020402; EP 1027245 A1 20000816; EP 1027245 B1 20011219; ES 2170539 T3 20020801; JP 2001522758 A 20011120; NO 20002197 A 20000427; NO 20002197 D0 20000427; US 2003084814 A1 20030508; US 6860210 B2 20050301; WO 9924304 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-08-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802576

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211090 T

- Effective date: 20131030

2014-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061030

2005-10-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170539 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802576 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211090 T 20020115

2001-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI