Global Patent Index - EP 1027263 A1

EP 1027263 A1 2000-08-16 - BOTTLE CLOSURE WITH A GUARANTEE SEAL, ESPECIALLY FOR BOTTLES CONTAINING QUALITY DRINKS

Title (en)

BOTTLE CLOSURE WITH A GUARANTEE SEAL, ESPECIALLY FOR BOTTLES CONTAINING QUALITY DRINKS

Title (de)

FLASCHENVERSCHLUSS MIT GARANTIESIEGEL, INSBESONDERE FÜR HOCHWERTIGE GETRÄNKE ENTHALTENDE FLASCHEN

Title (fr)

FERMETURE DE BOUTEILLE AVEC JOINT D'ETANCHEITE GARANTI, NOTAMMENT POUR DES BOUTEILLES CONTENANT DES BOISSONS DE QUALITE

Publication

EP 1027263 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954335 A

Priority

  • EP 9806313 W
  • IT MI972423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921773A1] A bottle closure (10) with a guarantee seal, especially for bottles containing quality drinks, comprises a pouring assembly (15) for fixing to the neck (12) of a bottle (11) and a stopper (19) removably engaged in the pouring assembly (15); an outer, tubular cap (20) is fixed to the stopper (19) covering the stopper (19) and the pouring assembly (15); the cap (20) is fixed to the stopper (19) at an upper portion (26) of the cap itself and is also fixed to the pouring assembly (15) by a breakable seal; in order to provide a closure which is economical to manufacture and very difficult to counterfeit, the cap (20) is fixed to the pouring assembly (15) both axially and rotationally in a lower portion (31) of the cap (20) and an intermediate frangible strip (32) is interposed between the upper portion (26) and the lower portion (31) of the cap (20), integrally formed with the portions (26, 31) of the cap (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/78 (2010.01); B65D 49/04 (2006.01); B65D 90/10 (2006.01); B65D 90/24 (2006.01); B67D 7/32 (2010.01); B67D 7/84 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 49/04 (2013.01); B65D 47/123 (2013.01); B65D 51/18 (2013.01); B65D 55/0845 (2013.01); B67D 7/3209 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0038 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921773 A1 19990506; AU 1150199 A 19990517; BR 9813311 A 20000822; CN 1090139 C 20020904; CN 1278225 A 20001227; CO 4950582 A1 20000901; EP 1027263 A1 20000816; EP 1027263 B1 20020424; ES 2174505 T3 20021101; IT 1295928 B1 19990528; IT MI972423 A1 19990429; RU 2219114 C2 20031220

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170331 AND 20170405

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130221 AND 20130227

2010-01-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091210 AND 20091216

2009-04-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090402 AND 20090408

2009-03-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090226 AND 20090304

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174505 T3

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GUALA CLOSURES S.P.A.

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GUALA CLOSURES S.P.A.

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 17/00 A, 7B 65D 41/32 B, 7B 65D 49/04 B

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT