Global patent index - EP 1027275 A1

EP 1027275 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD FOR STORING SPOOLS, AND STORAGE DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STORING SPOOLS, AND STORAGE DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM LAGERN VON SPULEN UND LAGEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE STOCKAGE DE BOBINES ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE

Publication

EP 1027275 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951133 A

Priority

EP 9705993 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923023A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for storing spools (3), especially filament spools, comprising several spool carriers (2). According to the invention, the spools (3) are stored with an upright spool axis (6) in a shelf storage unit (1) with horizontal shelf compartments (17) for receiving individually movable spool carriers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06; D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/18 (2013.01); B65H 67/064 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923023A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923023 A1 19990514; DE 59705824 D1 20020124; EP 1027275 A1 20000816; EP 1027275 B1 20011212; ES 2165632 T3 20020316; US 6431809 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AC-AUTOMATION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59705824

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59705824

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59705824

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59705824

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CERTUS MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2165632

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59705824

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT