Global Patent Index - EP 1027278 A1

EP 1027278 A1 2000-08-16 - LIQUID DISPENSING TAP

Title (en)

LIQUID DISPENSING TAP

Title (de)

ABGABEVENTIL FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

ROBINET DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1027278 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98946536 A

Priority

  • FR 9802096 W
  • FR 9713869 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770606A1] The invention concerns a liquid dispensing tap designed to be placed on a container with a single flow opening, such as a bottle with its neck pointing downwards, consisting of: a) two juxtaposed flexible tubes (2, 3); b) closure means (47) by squeezing the two tubes; c) plugging means (4, 56) for hermetically sealing the orifice around the two tubes when the tap is installed on the container. Moreover, one of the tubes (3) has locally in the proximity of its end (9) facing inside the container a reduced internal diameter. Preferably, the internal cross-section of each of the two tubes (2, 3) is of the order of 50 to 80 mm<2> and the reduced cross-section of the second tube (3) is of the order of 3 to 4 mm<2> over a height of 2 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923029A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770606 A1 19990507; FR 2770606 B1 20000121; AU 9355098 A 19990524; CA 2311289 A1 19990514; DE 69802711 D1 20020110; DE 69802711 T2 20030410; EP 1027278 A1 20000816; EP 1027278 B1 20011128; ES 2169556 T3 20020701; PT 1027278 E 20020531; WO 9923029 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2006-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LESAGE PHILIPPE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-10-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020911

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-06 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020906

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020815

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169556 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802711 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2001-11-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT