Global patent index - EP 1027407 A1

EP 1027407 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COMBUSTIBLE GAS, SYNTHESIS GAS AND REDUCING GAS FROM SOLID FUELS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COMBUSTIBLE GAS, SYNTHESIS GAS AND REDUCING GAS FROM SOLID FUELS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BRENN-, SYNTHESE- UND REDUKTIONSGAS AUS FESTEN BRENNSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION, DE GAZ DE SYNTHESE ET DE GAZ DE REDUCTION A PARTIR DE COMBUSTIBLES SOLIDES

Publication

EP 1027407 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949009 A

Priority

  • DE 19747324 A
  • EP 9806342 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747324A1] The reactor has a combined fuel burner (1), a combustion chamber (9) endothermal suspended flow gasifier (14) and thermal equalization channel (26) from the combustion chamber, with thermally protective cladding (32) of the reactor. A water bath (19) is located below the reactor. The channel includes quenching (30) for gases (23) leaving the gasifier (14). The cladding at combustion chamber level has a matching cooling unit (27). The combination burner (1) ignites and heats the reactor, with connections for ignition air (5) and fuel (2). Combustion air (3) and an igniter (6) are connected. Sub-stoichiometric combustion is maintained at up to 500 deg C. Heat is evolved, with gaseous products (4), residual coke or char and ash (with additives). The gasification media enter via swirl baffles (33) to react in the combustion chamber (9), where the ash fusion temperature is exceeded. Swirl centrifuges molten solids to the walls. The reaction chamber base is a slag interception sump with drain channels (12) for liquid slag, and a gas outlet (34). Slag droplets (18) are led off with the plunging jet (16) into the suspension flow gasifier, to fall into the water sump, where they cool as glass granules. The plunging jet carries slag droplets countercurrent to the rising gas flow (23). Fly ash is entrained by pneumatic lances for further reaction at up to 500-1500 deg C. Baffles connected to the heat exchange channel cause swirling and convective heat transfer, reducing the temperature of the combustion chamber wall. On the inner wall (9), this forms a protective layer of solidified slag, The flow leaves by the outlet (25), carrying away heat accepted. The water bath has with an outlet for the non-eluting slag granules, a weir (20) and a water supply.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/46; C10J 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/46 (2006.01); C10J 3/48 (2006.01); C10J 3/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/506 (2013.01); C10J 3/487 (2013.01); C10J 3/526 (2013.01); C10J 3/66 (2013.01); C10J 3/84 (2013.01); C10K 1/04 (2013.01); C10K 1/101 (2013.01); C10J 2200/152 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921940A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747324 A1 19990429; DE 19747324 C2 19991104; AR 010952 A1 20000712; AT 200791 T 20010515; AU 754147 B2 20021107; AU 9542798 A 19990517; BR 9813292 A 20000822; BR 9813292 B1 20091201; CA 2306889 A1 19990506; CA 2306889 C 20081216; CN 1136299 C 20040128; CN 1278292 A 20001227; DK 1027407 T3 20010813; EP 1027407 A1 20000816; EP 1027407 B1 20010425; ES 2157673 T3 20010816; GR 3036233 T3 20011031; ID 21135 A 19990429; JP 2001521056 A 20011106; JP 4112173 B2 20080702; MY 127842 A 20061229; NO 20001993 A 20000615; NO 20001993 D0 20000417; NO 328487 B1 20100301; PL 190794 B1 20060131; PL 340217 A1 20010115; PT 1027407 E 20011030; TW 518363 B 20030121; WO 9921940 A1 19990506; ZA 9809759 B 19990503

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151006

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: LINDE AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 200791

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130814

2013-08-12 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LINDE AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20130805

2013-07-10 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LINDE AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59800654

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130404

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800654

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZELLENTIN & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800654

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZELLENTIN & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130225

2013-05-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LINDE AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130412

2013-05-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130404 AND 20130410

2013-04-09 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: LINDE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20130326

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071006

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061006

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHOREN INDUSTRIES G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BODO WOLF

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-07-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061006

2006-09-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-20 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-29 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: WOLF, BODO

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157673

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CHOREN INDUSTRIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800654

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-31

2001-05-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CHOREN INDUSTRIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-05-16 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: CHOREN INDUSTRIES GMBH

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200791

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRG KOHLENSTOFFRECYCLING GES.MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CRG KOHLENSTOFFRECYCLING GES.MBH

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE