Global Patent Index - EP 1027420 A1

EP 1027420 A1 2000-08-16 - CLEANING IN THE FOOD INDUSTRY

Title (en)

CLEANING IN THE FOOD INDUSTRY

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE NAHRUNGSMITTELINDUSTRIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DESTINE A L'INDUSTRIE ALIMENTAIRE

Publication

EP 1027420 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930039 A

Priority

  • SE 9801274 W
  • SE 9702502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900474A1] Method and agents for the cleaning of packing machines and similar handling equipment for food, where considerations have to be taken to the corrosion susceptibility of construction metals and the requirement of high hygiene standard are strict. Washing is done with an alkaline washing agent, which, in use solution, has pH between 8.5 and 11. Rinsing is done with an acid rinsing agent, which contains hydrogen peroxide and, in use solution, has pH between 2.5 and 6. pH is stabilized by a weak acid or acid mixture that buffers so that pH during the rinsing does no rise above 7.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/044 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 11/0041 (2013.01); C11D 11/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900474A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900474 A1 19990107; AU 7952098 A 19990119; BR 9810466 A 20000905; DE 69823689 D1 20040609; DK 1027420 T3 20040830; EE 03932 B1 20021216; EE 9900608 A 20000815; EP 1027420 A1 20000816; EP 1027420 B1 20040506; NO 319928 B1 20051003; NO 996485 A 20000202; NO 996485 D0 19991227; PL 337669 A1 20000828; SE 512839 C2 20000522; SE 9702502 D0 19970627; SE 9702502 L 19981228

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-08-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-08-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823689 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB SE

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV

2004-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000121;LV PAYMENT 20000121