Global Patent Index - EP 1027429 A1

EP 1027429 A1 2000-08-16 - JNK3 MODULATORS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

JNK3 MODULATORS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

JNK3 MODULATOREN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

MODULATEURS DE JNK3 ET LEURS METHODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1027429 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954937 A

Priority

  • US 9820904 W
  • US 6099597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918193A1] The c-Jun NH2-terminal kinase (JNK) group of MAP kinases are activated by exposure of cells to environmental stress. The role of JNK in the brain was examined by targeted disruption of the gene that encodes the neuronal isoform JNK3. It was found that JNK3 is required for the normal response to seizure activity. Methods of screening for molecules and compounds that decrease JNK3 expression or activity are described. Such molecules or compounds are useful for treating disorders involving excitotoxicity such as seizure disorders, Alzheimer's disease, Huntington disease, Parkinson's disease, and ischaemia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; A01N 43/04; A61K 31/70; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/82 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0276 (2013.01); C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); C07K 14/82 (2013.01); C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2217/075 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/03 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0318 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0356 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918193 A1 19990415; AU 1186099 A 19990427; AU 756401 B2 20030109; CA 2302874 A1 19990415; CA 2302874 C 20110712; DE 69837931 D1 20070726; DE 69837931 T2 20080221; DE 69841792 D1 20100909; EP 1027429 A1 20000816; EP 1027429 A4 20021120; EP 1027429 B1 20070613; HK 1031128 A1 20070824; JP 2001519146 A 20011023; JP 2010233570 A 20101021; US 2003023990 A1 20030130; US 2006035303 A1 20060216; US 2012240247 A1 20120920; US 6943000 B2 20050913

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111005

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69837931

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111005

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080314

2007-08-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031128

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837931 P 20070726

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2007-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040527

2002-11-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB