Global Patent Index - EP 1027471 A1

EP 1027471 A1 2000-08-16 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A COATING BAR FOR USE IN THE PAPER INDUSTRY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A COATING BAR FOR USE IN THE PAPER INDUSTRY

Title (de)

VORRRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES RAKELSTABES VERWENDBAR IN DER PAPIERINDUSTRIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REALISATION D'UNE BARRE DE COUCHAGE UTILISABLE DANS L'INDUSTRIE PAPETIERE

Publication

EP 1027471 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98952800 A

Priority

  • FR 9802300 W
  • FR 9713449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770156A1] To produce a coating spreader bar (1), for the paper making industry, the two ends (2,4) are supported (3,5) at a frame (10) for one end (2) to be rotated. The bar (1) is drawn during coating, to give a stretch of 0.2-0.001%. The coated bar (1) is held on a straight line during coating. Tension is applied to one end (4) of the bar while the other end is fixed. The coating is with a hot ceramic material, sprayed on to the bar. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus where a pull force is exerted (15,16) on one end (4) of the bar (1), while the other end (2) is fixed, using pulling pistons (16) at the frame (10). The pulling action is applied while the bar (1) is rotated by a motor (6) and a hot spray (12) of ceramic coating is directed at the bar (1). The bar (1) is centered and held by a fluid or mechanical magnetic bearing. Shroudings, of adjustable and angled straight masks, define the section of the bar (1) to be coated by the hot sprays. A cooling system is at the opposite side of the bar (1) to the hot sprays, using sputtering jets to give streams of CO2. A trolley (13) carries a plasma torch (12), to apply the hot ceramic coating, moving along the length of the bar (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/12; C23C 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 13/04 (2006.01); B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B05C 5/04 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01); C23C 4/14 (2006.01); C23C 4/16 (2006.01); B05B 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 13/0442 (2013.01); B05B 15/0443 (2013.01); C23C 4/12 (2013.01); C23C 4/14 (2013.01); B05B 7/226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770156 A1 19990430; FR 2770156 B1 19991224; AT 203785 T 20010815; DE 69801287 D1 20010906; DE 69801287 T2 20020508; EP 1027471 A1 20000816; EP 1027471 B1 20010801; JP 2001521064 A 20011106; US 2003084841 A1 20030508; US 6761768 B2 20040713; WO 9922041 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *BTG ECLEPENS

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071207

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071005

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071101

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801287 20010906

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

2001-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203785 T 20010815

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI SE