Global Patent Index - EP 1027478 A1

EP 1027478 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING CORROSION RESISTANCE OF REINFORCED CONCRETE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IMPROVING CORROSION RESISTANCE OF REINFORCED CONCRETE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT VON STAHLBETON

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION DU BETON ARME

Publication

EP 1027478 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951521 A

Priority

  • DE 19748105 A
  • EP 9806512 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748105C1] The invention relates to a method for improving the corrosion resistance of reinforced concrete coated with a thermal spray coating made of metal, especially zinc or zinc alloys. The spray coating is electrically interconnected to the reinforcement and additionally coated with a polyurethane resin which is applied as a low viscosity solution in the organic solvents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 13/02; C23C 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/18 (2006.01); C23F 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/18 (2013.01); C23F 13/10 (2013.01); C23F 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923282A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748105 C1 19981029; AU 745500 B2 20020321; AU 9750198 A 19990524; BR 9813171 A 20000822; CA 2307831 A1 19990514; CA 2307831 C 20061212; CN 1207444 C 20050622; CN 1276839 A 20001213; DK 1027478 T3 20020521; EP 1027478 A1 20000816; EP 1027478 B1 20020130; ES 2172223 T3 20020916; HK 1028795 A1 20020628; IL 135739 A 20040927; IL 135739 D0 20010520; NO 20002130 A 20000426; NO 20002130 D0 20000426; NO 319769 B1 20050912; PT 1027478 E 20020628; TR 200001150 T2 20000821; US 6224943 B1 20010501; WO 9923282 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-10-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172223

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020400540

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802985

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-14

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU NL PT SE