Global Patent Index - EP 1027500 A2

EP 1027500 A2 2000-08-16 - PAVING STONE, SET OF PAVING STONES AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

PAVING STONE, SET OF PAVING STONES AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

PFLASTERSTEIN, BAUSATZ AUS PFLASTERSTEINEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN

Title (fr)

PAVE, JEU DE PAVES ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1027500 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98950083 A

Priority

  • DE 19747421 A
  • EP 9806118 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747421A1] The blocks (10) are laid in a pattern with intermediate joints (32). Due to the shape of the block sides, the joints have a profile diverging downwards away from the top block faces (17). Upright sides are at an angle of 0,5 to 3 deg , esp. approx. 1,5 deg relative to an imaginary vertical plane. Angled sides (28) have an inclination of up to 30 deg , e.g. not larger than the dumping angle of the joint filler. A square upper block section (15) and a lower section (16) with projections (18) and recesses (19) are laid relatively offset, with distance pieces (36) between upright sides of the lower section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/00; B28B 7/00; E01C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01); E01C 5/00 (2006.01); E01C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/06 (2013.01); B28B 7/0064 (2013.01); B28B 7/0082 (2013.01); E01C 5/00 (2013.01); E01C 2201/02 (2013.01); E01C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922072A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747421 A1 19990429; AT 299542 T 20050715; AU 9628398 A 19990517; CA 2307228 A1 19990506; CA 2307228 C 20070522; DE 59812925 D1 20050818; DK 1027500 T3 20051114; EP 1027500 A2 20000816; EP 1027500 B1 20050713; ES 2245045 T3 20051216; US 6263633 B1 20010724; WO 9922072 A2 19990506; WO 9922072 A3 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150925

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130926

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130912

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110925

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 299542 T

- Effective date: 20110925

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110925

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110925

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110912

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245045 T3

2005-11-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-11-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812925 P 20050818

2005-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000415

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE