Global Patent Index - EP 1027505 A1

EP 1027505 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD OF PRODUCING INSULATION MATERIAL, ORGANIC FIBROUS MATERIAL, AND BLOW INSULATION METHOD FOR PERFORMING INSULATION

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING INSULATION MATERIAL, ORGANIC FIBROUS MATERIAL, AND BLOW INSULATION METHOD FOR PERFORMING INSULATION

Title (de)

METHODE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ISOLIERMATERIAL, MATERIAL AUS ORGANISCHEN FASERN UND BLASVERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINER ISOLATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU D'ISOLATION, MATERIAU FIBREUX ORGANIQUE ET PROCEDE D'ISOLATION PAR SOUFFLAGE POUR L'APPLICATION D'UNE ISOLATION

Publication

EP 1027505 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950136 A

Priority

  • FI 9800835 W
  • FI 974069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922084A1] A method of producing an insulation material, the method comprising fiberizing a wood material or another fiberizable material in the manufacturing process of pulp, performing washing and drying, said insulation material being refiberized later so as to provide it with a larger volume. The method is characterized in that an adhesive is added to the insulation material after the washing step but before the refiberization to be performed later so as to provide the insulation material with a larger volume.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 1/00 (2006.01); B27N 3/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/74 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7662 (2013.01); E04B 1/74 (2013.01); E04B 1/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922084A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922084 A1 19990506; AT 292718 T 20050415; AU 9631898 A 19990517; CA 2307326 A1 19990506; CA 2307326 C 20080108; CN 1278313 A 20001227; DE 69829687 D1 20050512; DE 69829687 T2 20060309; DK 1027505 T3 20050801; EP 1027505 A1 20000816; EP 1027505 B1 20050406; ES 2243009 T3 20051116; FI 104476 B 20000215; FI 974069 A0 19971027; FI 974069 A 19990428; JP 2001520955 A 20011106; JP 4262885 B2 20090513; NO 20002200 A 20000627; NO 20002200 D0 20000427; NO 327247 B1 20090518; PT 1027505 E 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151126

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-08-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-07-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 292718 T

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-06-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69829687

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131101

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-04-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: LEMAN CONSULTING S.A.;CHEMIN DE PRECOSSY 31;1260 NYON (CH)

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243009 T3

2005-09-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-08-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-07-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LEMAN CONSULTING S.A.

2005-07-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829687 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV RO

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEPA OY

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030627

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000422;LV PAYMENT 20000422;RO PAYMENT 20000422