Global patent index - EP 1027509 A1

EP 1027509 A1 2000-08-16 - GUTTER

Title (en)

GUTTER

Title (de)

DACHRINNE

Title (fr)

GOUTTIERE

Publication

EP 1027509 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98954825 A

Priority

  • NL 9800626 W
  • NL 1007392 A
  • NL 1007393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922094A1] A gutter (12), for instance roof gutter, is known which comprises: a bearing structure (16) adapted for fixing to a building structure, such as a house, stable or other building; a gutter structure supported by this bearing structure (16) and comprising an elongate, substantially prismatic trough (3, 4, 5) open at the top for collecting and transporting liquid such as rainwater or manure to a drainage zone, for instance a rainpipe, wherein the trough (3, 4, 5) has a substantially prismatic form and has on both its upper edges (10, 11) substantially stiff coupling means which form part of this prismatic form or are separate (13, 14) and with which the trough (3, 4, 5) is coupled to the bearing structure (16) so as to be supported thereby along substantially its whole length.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/064; E04D 13/072

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/064 (2006.01); E04D 13/068 (2006.01); E04D 13/072 (2006.01); E04D 13/076 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0722 (2013.01); E04D 13/064 (2013.01); E04D 13/0641 (2013.01); E04D 13/068 (2013.01); E04D 13/0725 (2013.01); E04D 13/076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922094 A1 19990506; AU 1177599 A 19990517; AU 1177699 A 19990517; DE 69833024 D1 20060202; DE 69833024 T2 20060810; DE 69833025 D1 20060202; DE 69833025 T2 20060803; EP 1027509 A1 20000816; EP 1027509 B1 20051228; EP 1027510 A1 20000816; EP 1027510 B1 20051228; ES 2251785 T3 20060501; ES 2251786 T3 20060501; WO 9922093 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69833024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-05-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WIDEE B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111101

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091030

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091029

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091029

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WIDEE B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20091207

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2251785

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69833024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-03-05 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: WILDKAMP B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE WILDKAMP B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL