Global Patent Index - EP 1027520 A1

EP 1027520 A1 2000-08-16 - PRE-ORIENTING NOZZLE

Title (en)

PRE-ORIENTING NOZZLE

Title (de)

VORORIENTIERTE DÜSE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE BUSE PRE-ORIENTABLE

Publication

EP 1027520 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98957378 A

Priority

  • US 9822696 W
  • US 95808797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922110A1] A nozzle assembly (10) for use in a drill bit (11) includes a nozzle body (12) having a nozzle oriented at an angle to the longitudinal axis (26) of the nozzle body (12) and a positioning ring (14) that is rotationally and axially locked to the nozzle body (12). The nozzle body (12) includes a plurality of facets (40) extending between a pair of retention surfaces. The positioning ring (14) has a plurality of teeth (54) and is operatively disposed between the retention surfaces (58, 60) to axially retain the ring (14) on the nozzle body (12). When positioned between the retention surfaces (58, 60), the teeth (54) engage the facets (40) to rotationally lock the ring (14) to the nozzle body (12). The positioning ring (14) may have a longitudinal split, to allow the ring (14) to ratchet relative to the nozzle body (12), and a pair of spanner-receiving apertures (62).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/18; E21B 10/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/06 (2006.01); E21B 10/60 (2006.01); E21B 10/61 (2006.01); E21B 10/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/61 (2013.01); B05B 15/065 (2013.01); E21B 10/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922110 A1 19990506; WO 9922110 A8 19990603; AU 1365499 A 19990517; DE 1027520 T1 20010315; EP 1027520 A1 20000816; EP 1027520 A4 20040908; US 6029756 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-09-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040726

2001-03-15 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-03-15 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROGERS TOOL WORKS, INC.

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

2000-11-17 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-11-17 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROGERS TOOL WORKS, INC.

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT