Global Patent Index - EP 1027531 A1

EP 1027531 A1 2000-08-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LUBRICATING AND SIMULTANEOUSLY SUPPLYING FUEL IN COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LUBRICATING AND SIMULTANEOUSLY SUPPLYING FUEL IN COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHMIERUNG UND GLEICHZEITIGEN KRAFTSTOFFVERSORGUNG EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE LUBRIFIER ET SIMULTANEMENT D'ALIMENTER EN CARBURANT UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1027531 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956878 A

Priority

  • DE 19747853 A
  • EP 9806806 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747853A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for lubricating and simultaneously supplying fuel in a combustion engine, whereby a vegetable oil containing additives is continuously supplied as a lubricant during operation and the vegetable oil-lubricant used is fed together with a mixture of fresh vegetable oil and rape oil or rape oil-methyl ester into the engine and burned as a motor fuel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 9/04 (2006.01); F01M 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 9/04 (2013.01); F01M 11/0458 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0475 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923365A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747853 A1 19990506; AT 231949 T 20030215; AU 1336399 A 19990524; EP 1027531 A1 20000816; EP 1027531 B1 20030129; ES 2191978 T3 20030916; US 6382170 B1 20020507; WO 9923365 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FUCHS PETROLUB SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FUCHS PETROLUB AG, 68169 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59807089

- Effective date: 20130917

2013-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807089

- Representative's name: MUELLER SCHUPFNER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20130917

2013-09-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807089

- Representative's name: MUELLER SCHUPFNER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-12-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191978 T3

2003-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807089 P 20030306

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE