Global Patent Index - EP 1027541 A1

EP 1027541 A1 2000-08-16 - REGULATING DEVICE FOR POSITIVE-DISPLACEMENT PUMPS

Title (en)

REGULATING DEVICE FOR POSITIVE-DISPLACEMENT PUMPS

Title (de)

REGELEINRICHTUNG FÜR VERDRÄNGERPUMPEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF REGULATEUR POUR POMPES VOLUMETRIQUES

Publication

EP 1027541 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959792 A

Priority

  • DE 19747341 A
  • EP 9806709 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747341A1] The control mechanism for displacement pumps has a control piston (17) with at least one control edge (19). Working with the opening of the throttle channel (12), the cross section surface of the throttle channel is reduced while the piston moves towards the spring zone (15). The control piston also has at least one further control edge, which increases the cross section surface of the throttle channel while the piston moves towards the spring zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/26 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/03 (2006.01); F04B 49/035 (2006.01); F04C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/26 (2013.01); F04C 2270/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922143A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747341 A1 19990429; BR 9813305 A 20000822; EP 1027541 A1 20000816; EP 1027541 B1 20010829; ES 2163899 T3 20020201; JP 2001521104 A 20011106; JP 4108272 B2 20080625; US 6257841 B1 20010710; WO 9922143 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801349

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121022

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-10-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-03-25 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 02/04 PAGES: 246 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE CETTE TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163899 T3

2002-01-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801349 20011004

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT