Global Patent Index - EP 1027559 A1

EP 1027559 A1 2000-08-16 - GAS-HEATED WATER HEATER, ESPECIALLY AN INSTANTANEOUS WATER HEATER

Title (en)

GAS-HEATED WATER HEATER, ESPECIALLY AN INSTANTANEOUS WATER HEATER

Title (de)

GASBEHEIZTER WASSERERHITZER, INSBESONDERE DURCHLAUFERHITZER

Title (fr)

CHAUFFE-EAU A GAZ, NOTAMMENT CHAUFFE-EAU INSTANTANE

Publication

EP 1027559 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932635 A

Priority

  • DE 9901359 W
  • DE 19825138 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825138A1] The invention relates to a gas-heated water heater, especially an instantaneous water heater, with a gas supply device (40, 42, 58, 60), a burner (16) and an igniter (48, 62) for the combustion gas-air mixture, in addition to an electrical supply device (26) and means for determining the presence of a flame. According to the invention, the combustion process can be verified with the aid of an electrical operation display (20), which makes it possible for a user to simply detect the existence of a flame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/26; F23N 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/12 (2006.01); F23N 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/123 (2013.01); F23N 5/265 (2013.01); F23N 2031/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964790A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825138 A1 19991209; EP 1027559 A1 20000816; EP 1027559 B1 20030924; ES 2209463 T3 20040616; PT 1027559 E 20040227; WO 9964790 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907113

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907113

2014-11-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209463 T3

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907113 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES PT

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PAIS DE SOUSA, MARIO

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEEBAUER, MANFRED

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES PT