Global Patent Index - EP 1027561 A1

EP 1027561 A1 2000-08-16 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH A FRONT PANEL

Title (en)

HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH A FRONT PANEL

Title (de)

HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT FRONTBLENDE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL MENAGER A PANNEAU FRONTAL

Publication

EP 1027561 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956889 A

Priority

  • DE 19747769 A
  • EP 9806847 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747769A1] A household appliance, such as an oven, with a front panel running along the width of said appliance and extending over the front side thereof is already known per se. Said panel is formed by a metal extruded section secured to the household appliance and is provided with control and/or display elements. In order to improve the stability of the front panel, the invention is characterised in that said panel extends in the form of a cylindrical partition section around a vertical axis along the width of said panel and is provided with a substantially homogenous curvature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922177A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747769 A1 19990506; DE 19747769 C2 19991216; EP 1027561 A1 20000816; EP 1027561 B1 20010926; PL 339672 A1 20010102; US 6065820 A 20000523; WO 9922177 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021022

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-08-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

2004-06-29 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2004-05-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

2004-04-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Effective date: 20020625

2004-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-03-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Effective date: 20020625

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-11-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031106

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

2002-08-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

- Effective date: 20020625

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801590

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-31

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000529

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000529