Global Patent Index - EP 1027571 A1

EP 1027571 A1 2000-08-16 - FRAME ARRANGEMENT FOR A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

FRAME ARRANGEMENT FOR A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

RAHMENANORDNUNG FÜR PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE CADRE DESTINE A UN ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1027571 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951877 A

Priority

  • SE 9801934 W
  • SE 9703993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923434A1] The invention concerns a plate heat exchanger comprising a frame plate (1a), a pressure plate (1b) and a core of heat transferring plates placed between the frame plate (1a) and the pressure plate (1b). A plurality of threaded tie bars (3) extend between the frame plate (1a) and the pressure plate (1b) and are arranged, with the aid of nuts (6) or the like, to hold these plates at a desired distance from each other in order to hold the core of heat transferring plates together. The plate heat exchanger is among other things characterized by that at least one of the threaded tie bars (3) creates a guiding element (3) for the pressure plate (1b) and the heat transferring plates, which guiding element extends through a hole (4) in the pressure plate (1b) and further to an area situated at a substantial distance from this plate, that the guiding element (3) is surrounded by a protecting sleeve (5a) extending from the frame plate (1a) to the pressure plate (1b) and protecting the threads of the guiding element (3) from engagement with the heat transferring plates and that the guiding element (3) is arranged to be connected to a supporting device (9) in the mentioned area situated at a substantial distance from the pressure plate (1b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00; F28F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/08 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/083 (2013.01); F28F 9/001 (2013.01); F28F 2275/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923434A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923434 A1 19990514; AU 9771398 A 19990524; DE 69810151 D1 20030123; DE 69810151 T2 20030417; EP 1027571 A1 20000816; EP 1027571 B1 20021211; ES 2189258 T3 20030701; SE 510724 C2 19990614; SE 9703993 D0 19971030; SE 9703993 L 19990501

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151028

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810151

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189258 T3

2003-03-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810151 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020405

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE