Global Patent Index - EP 1027688 A2

EP 1027688 A2 2000-08-16 - DEVICE FOR LOCKING AND UNLOCKING THE LID OF A CASH REGISTER-CONTROLLED MONEY CHEST

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LOCKING AND UNLOCKING THE LID OF A CASH REGISTER-CONTROLLED MONEY CHEST

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM VERRIEGELN UND ENTRIEGELN DES DECKELS EINER REGISTRIERKASSENGESTEUERTEN GELDLADE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR VERROUILLER ET DEVERROUILLER LE COUVERCLE D'UN TIROIR-CAISSE COMMANDE PAR UNE CAISSE ENREGISTREUSE

Publication

EP 1027688 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98954168 A

Priority

  • DE 9802702 W
  • DE 19743691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743691C1] The arrangement locks and unlocks the cover (8) of a money tray (2) of a cash register, which is arranged and fixed on a stationary base part (24). The arrangement includes a bolt (36) arranged at a money tray casing (4), which is movable between an unlocking position and a locking position. A solenoid has a drive lever. A locking element (32), movable between an effective position and an ineffective position, is activated by a lock (18) to move the bolt. A key channel of the lock is concealed when the money tray is placed on the base part. The lock is preferably installed in a wall (12) of the money tray casing, which is covered by the base part or another object located directly at the installation place of the money tray casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/46 (2006.01); G07G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/0027 (2013.01); E05B 65/461 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918550A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743691 C1 19990114; EP 1027688 A2 20000816; EP 1027688 B1 20020410; ES 2175811 T3 20021116; HU 0003838 A2 20010428; HU 0003838 A3 20010528; HU 220935 B1 20020629; WO 9918550 A2 19990415; WO 9918550 A3 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150912

2016-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150911

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-06-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150911

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140910

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140910

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175811 T3

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000307

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB NL