Global patent index - EP 1027741 A1

EP 1027741 A1 2000-08-16 - ORGANIC DIODES WITH SWITCHABLE PHOTOSENSITIVITY

Title (en)

ORGANIC DIODES WITH SWITCHABLE PHOTOSENSITIVITY

Title (de)

ORGANISCHE DIODEN MIT SCHALTBARER PHOTOEMPFINDLICHKEIT

Title (fr)

DIODES ORGANIQUES A PHOTOSENSIBILITE COMMUTABLE

Publication

EP 1027741 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939408 A

Priority

  • US 9816935 W
  • US 5584097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909603A1] Organic diode detectors (10) with switchable photosensitivity are achieved using organic photo layers (12) in the photodiodes and a detector circuit (15, 16) which applies a reverse or forward bias voltage across the diodes. These diodes can be arranged in matrices which function as high-performance, two-dimensional image sensors. These image sensors can achieve full color or selected color detection capability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 27/00; H01L 27/146; H01L 51/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/20 (2006.01); G01T 1/29 (2006.01); G01T 1/36 (2006.01); H01L 27/146 (2006.01); H01L 27/30 (2006.01); H01L 31/10 (2006.01); H01L 51/00 (2006.01); H01L 51/05 (2006.01); H01L 51/30 (2006.01); H01L 51/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/307 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); H01L 27/14643 (2013.01); H01L 51/0591 (2013.01); H01L 51/4206 (2013.01); H01L 51/0036 (2013.01); H01L 51/0038 (2013.01); H01L 51/0039 (2013.01); H01L 51/0041 (2013.01); H01L 51/0042 (2013.01); H01L 51/0046 (2013.01); H01L 51/0059 (2013.01); H01L 51/424 (2013.01); H01L 51/4253 (2013.01); Y02E 10/549 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909603 A1 19990225; WO 9909603 A9 19990514; AU 8783998 A 19990308; CN 1143400 C 20040324; CN 1270706 A 20001018; EP 1027741 A1 20000816; EP 1027741 A4 20051012; HK 1030482 A1 20041224; JP 2001516150 A 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060925

2005-10-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050826

2005-07-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01L 27/00 A

2005-07-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01L 51/20 B

2005-07-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01L 27/146 B

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUPONT DISPLAYS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL