Global Patent Index - EP 1027751 A1

EP 1027751 A1 2000-08-16 - DIGITALLY CONTROLLED MONOLITHIC MICROWAVE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS

Title (en)

DIGITALLY CONTROLLED MONOLITHIC MICROWAVE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS

Title (de)

DIGITAL GESTEUERTE MONOLITHISCH INTEGRIERTE MIKROWELLENSCHALTUNGEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUITS INTEGRES MONOLITHIQUES HYPERFREQUENCE A COMMANDE NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1027751 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98956504 A

Priority

  • US 9823367 W
  • US 96345397 A
  • US 96356297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923717A1] A transmit/receive module including digitally controlled analog circuits is described. The digital circuits use a logic family adapted for use with analog monolithic integrated circuits. The disclosure also describes a preferred process to provide digital and analog microwave circuits on a common semiconductor substrate (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/22; H01Q 3/24; H01Q 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/00 (2006.01); H01P 1/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/0025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923717 A1 19990514; WO 9923717 A8 19990729; AU 1301399 A 19990524; EP 1027751 A1 20000816; EP 1027751 A4 20081203

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090728

2009-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090316

2008-12-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081104

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01Q 21/00 20060101AFI20070806BHEP

2007-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01P 1/15 20060101ALI20070806BHEP

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAYTHEON COMPANY

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT