Global Patent Index - EP 1027796 A2

EP 1027796 A2 2000-08-16 - DISTRIBUTED WEB APPLICATION SERVER

Title (en)

DISTRIBUTED WEB APPLICATION SERVER

Title (de)

VERTEILTER WEB- ANWENDUNGS- SERVER

Title (fr)

SERVEUR D'APPLICATION WEB REPARTI

Publication

EP 1027796 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98956211 A

Priority

  • US 9822656 W
  • US 96248597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923784A2] A system, method, and computer readable-medium for performing operations associated with browser (202, 204, 206) requests are provided. The system includes a plurality of dispatchers (214, 220, 226) coupled to a plurality of web listener (210, 216, 222). Each of the dispatchers (214, 220, 226) receives from a corresponding web listener (210, 216, 222) browser requests received by the corresponding web listener (210, 216, 222). The system further includes a virtual path manager (250) and a resource manager (254). The virtual path manager (250) is coupled to the dispatchers (214, 220, 226) through an inter-machine communication (282) mechanism. The virtual path manager (250) indicates to the dispatchers (214, 220, 226) which of a cartridge (260) is associated with the browser requests. The resource manager (254) is coupled to the dispatchers (214, 220, 226) through the inter-machine communication (262) mechanism. The resource manager (254) is configured to assign to each dispatcher (214, 220, 226) an instance of a cartridge of the cartridges (260) in response to receiving a request for an instance from the dispatcher (214, 220, 226). The dispatchers (214, 220, 226) are configured to send messages through the inter-machine communication (282) mechanism to the instances that are assigned by the resource manager (254) to the dispatchers (214, 220, 226). The messages cause the instances to perform the operations associated with the browser requests.

[origin: WO9923784A2] A system, method, and computer readable-medium for performing operations associated with browser requests are provided. The system includes a plurality of dispatchers coupled to a plurality of web listeners. Each of the dispatchers receives from a corresponding web listener browser requests received by the corresponding web listener. The system further includes a virtual path manager and a resource manager. The virtual path manager is coupled to the dispatchers through an inter-machine communication mechanism. The virtual path manager indicates to the dispatchers which of a cartridge is associated with the browser requests. The resource manager is coupled to the dispatchers through the inter-machine communication mechanism. The resource manager is configured to assign to each dispatcher of the dispatchers an instance of a cartridge of the cartridges in response to receiving a request for an instance from the dispatcher. The dispatchers are configured to send messages through the inter-machine communication mechanism to the instances that are assigned by the resource manager to the dispatchers. The messages cause the instances to perform the operations associated with the browser requests.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06; G06F 1/00; G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/50 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G06F 21/00 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04L 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/5027 (2013.01); G06F 9/4843 (2013.01); G06F 9/5055 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 29/12009 (2013.01); H04L 61/00 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01); H04L 67/10 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); G06F 2209/5018 (2013.01); H04L 67/42 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99953 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923784A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923784 A2 19990514; WO 9923784 A3 19990715; WO 9923784 A9 20000720; WO 9923784 B1 19990826; AU 1278999 A 19990524; AU 742156 B2 20011220; CA 2308782 A1 19990514; CA 2308782 C 20090623; DE 69824879 D1 20040805; DE 69824879 T2 20050825; EP 1027796 A2 20000816; EP 1027796 B1 20040630; HK 1029686 A1 20041210; JP 2001522113 A 20011113; JP 3853592 B2 20061206; US 6247056 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-06-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ORACLE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20051116

2006-01-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-10 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029686

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824879 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHOU, TSUNG-JEN

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADUNUTHULA, SESHU

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANAND, MALA

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHARMA, ANKUR

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHIEN, ELAINE

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAKHODA, SHEHZAAD

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL