Global Patent Index - EP 1027800 A1

EP 1027800 A1 2000-08-16 - DIRECTORY ASSISTANCE METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (en)

DIRECTORY ASSISTANCE METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (de)

RUFNUMMERAUSKUNFTVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE-ANNUAIRE

Publication

EP 1027800 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950798 A

Priority

  • US 9820530 W
  • US 94040597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917520A1] A method for directory assistance in a geographic region in which local calls are serviced using multiple area codes (16, 18) begins in response to a directory assistance inquiry (10) by a caller. The inquiry is processed (12) by locating a destination number having an associated area code. An audible response is then communicated to the caller in the form of the destination number followed by the area code (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/493; H04M 1/2745

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/44 (2006.01); H04M 1/27 (2006.01); H04M 1/2745 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/493 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/274566 (2013.01); H04M 3/4931 (2013.01); H04M 3/42059 (2013.01); H04M 3/42102 (2013.01); H04M 2201/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917520 A1 19990408; WO 9917520 B1 19990701; AU 9675398 A 19990423; EP 1027800 A1 20000816; EP 1027800 A4 20040908; JP 2001518756 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-09-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 3/493 A

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/2745 B

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCANSOFT, INC.

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT