Global patent index - EP 1027841 A1

EP 1027841 A1 2000-08-16 - Stretchable bracelet, in particular a wrist-watch strap

Title (en)

Stretchable bracelet, in particular a wrist-watch strap

Title (de)

Dehnbares Armband, insbesondere Uhrarmband

Title (fr)

Bracelet etirable, en particulier bracelet de montre

Publication

EP 1027841 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100611 A

Priority

DE 19906127 A

Abstract (en)

The strap has two layers of offset links (10A,B) connected by brackets (11AB,12AB). Links (10A) in the top layer each have a cover element (20), which are fixed/removed by elastic deformation of their flexible straps (20A). The straps mainly cover the links in both layers and the connection brackets. The cover element has a U-shaped profile partially covering the long sides of a link, and forming a trough-like structure with the projecting straps.

Abstract (de)

Ein aus zwei Lagen übereinander liegender Glieder bestehendes dehnbares Armband weist ein Abdeckelement (20) auf, das auf ein zugehöriges Glied der oberen Lage des Armbandes unter elastischer Verformung montierbar und demontierbar ist. Hierbei überdecken die stirnseitigen Laschen (20A,20B) des Abdeckelementes die Stirnseiten der Glieder (10A,10B) beider Lagen zumindest im wesentlichen. Durch diese Anordnung der Abdeckung wird die Funktionsmechanik des Gliederbandes von den Stirnseiten her abgedeckt und eine optisch geschlossene Erscheinung des Gliederbandes erreicht. Die Anbringung des Abdeckelementes gewährleistet aber auch eine Blockierwirkung auf die Glieder des Gliederbandes beim Auftreten von Seitenkräften, so dass eine unbeabsichtigte Auftrennung des Gliederbandes verhindert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027841 A1 20000816; EP 1027841 B1 20030730; DE 19906127 A1 20000824; DE 19906127 C2 20020926; US 6442970 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50003053

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-08-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-11-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003053

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI