Global Patent Index - EP 1027846 A1

EP 1027846 A1 2000-08-16 - Cushion with removable cover

Title (en)

Cushion with removable cover

Title (de)

Kissen mit abnehmbaren Überzug

Title (fr)

Coussin avec housse amovible

Publication

EP 1027846 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500018 A

Priority

ES 9900363 U

Abstract (en)

The cushion comprises a padded core (2) and a cover (3) that is closed by means of a zipper or other conventional means in order to maintain the padded core (2) inside it. It also comprises one or more pairs of buttons (5) face to face, the buttons of each pair being on the outside of the larger surfaces of the cushion, said two buttons being connected in order to press the area where the buttons are located and to define the corresponding recess on each one of the two larger surfaces of the cushion. The connection of both buttons (5) is carried out as of a string (7) transversal to the padded core (2), this string having in its ends a fastening element (6) for the respective button (5) each fastening element (6) being located on the outside surface of the padded core (2), for the purpose of permitting snapping, and/or liberation, by pulling, of the button (5) for which purpose the button has on its inside part an element (8) complementary to the fastening element (6). The buttoning-unbuttoning means of the buttons (5) permit the release of the cover (3) from the padded core (2), without the need to handle in any way the strip (7), nor the fastening elements (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/023 (2013.01); A47C 31/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027846 A1 20000816; EP 1027846 B1 20040107; DE 60007567 D1 20040212; DE 60007567 T2 20041111; ES 1042028 U 19990801; ES 1042028 Y 20000201

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070211

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060211

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060211

2005-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007567 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CUSHION WITH REMOVABLE COVER

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021211

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI