Global Patent Index - EP 1027852 A2

EP 1027852 A2 2000-08-16 - Sealing strip

Title (en)

Sealing strip

Title (de)

Abdichtungsstreifen

Title (fr)

Ruban d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1027852 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300796 A

Priority

GB 9902704 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a sealing strip adapted to form a seal between a wall or vertical panel surface and a horizontal surface of a member that meets the vertical surface such as the surface of the rim of a bath, basin or shower tray rim or a kitchen work top, comprising, in transverse section a rigid, upstanding portion adapted to be held against the vertical surface above the horizontal surface; a rigid, depending portion adapted to be held between the vertical surface and the member; the upstanding and depending portions being connected by a nose-like portion adapted to cover the edge of the horizontal surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027852 A2 20000816; EP 1027852 A3 20010718; GB 2346554 A 20000816; GB 9902704 D0 19990331; GB 9924905 D0 19991222

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020119

2002-05-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/00 A

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI