Global patent index - EP 1027856 A1

EP 1027856 A1 2000-08-16 - Suction device

Title (en)

Suction device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Saugen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration

Publication

EP 1027856 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124623 A

Priority

DE 19905444 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a floor nozzle with an electric motor driven brush roller, a vacuum tube connected to the nozzle and a hose leading to a vacuum cleaner. The tube is connected to the hose via a tubular handle part (5) fitted with a functional element (6) with which the drive for the roller can be switched on and off independently of the operation of the vacuum cleaner. The functional element switches the brush roller drive on when the handle part is gripped and switches it off again as soon as the handle part is released.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Saugen mit einer Bodendüse (1), die eine elektromotorisch angetriebene Bürstenwalze aufweist, mit einem an die Bodendüse (1) angeschlossenen Saugrohr (2) und mit einem zu einem Bodenstaubsauger führenden Schlauch (4). Das Saugrohr (2) ist mit dem Schlauch (4) durch ein rohrförmiges Griffstück (5) verbunden. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Griffstück (5) mit einem Funktionselement (6) ausgerüstet, welches bei Erfassen des Griffstückes (5) den Antriebe der Bürstenwalze einschaltet und den Antrieb wieder ausschaltet, sobald das Griffstück (5) losgelassen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/2894 (2013.01); A47L 9/2805 (2013.01); A47L 9/2847 (2013.01); A47L 9/2857 (2013.01); A47L 9/2868 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027856 A1 20000816; EP 1027856 B1 20030423; DE 19905444 A1 20000824; DE 19905444 C2 20010913

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091211

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091210

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091210

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI