Global Patent Index - EP 1027909 A1

EP 1027909 A1 2000-08-16 - Net supporting pole and snow probing rod

Title (en)

Net supporting pole and snow probing rod

Title (de)

Stützstange für Netze sowie Lawinensonde

Title (fr)

Piquets supports de filets et perches de sondage de la neige

Publication

EP 1027909 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420019 A

Priority

FR 9902251 A

Abstract (en)

The fence support picket has a post (1) supporting a wire (5). The wall of the post tube is made from glass fibre reinforced plastic. The spike tip (7) is formed as a moulding with a tubular upper spigot to receive the lower end of the post tube.

Abstract (fr)

Perfectionnement aux piquets supports de filets et aux perches de sondage de la neige. Le corps principal (1) des piquets supports de filets (5) et des perches de sondage qui sont traditionnellement en tube d'aluminium extrudé sont remplacés par des tiges ou des tubes à paroi épaisse en polyester armé de fils de verre pultrudés enduits de résine polyester polycondensable, améliorant la résistance à la déformation permanente due aux efforts supportés en cours de service et conduisant à reconsidérer la conception des pointes des extrémités inférieures (7) et des dispositifs d'accrochage des extrémités supérieures 11. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 19/06; A63B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/02 (2006.01); A63C 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/021 (2013.01); A63C 19/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027909 A1 20000816; EP 1027909 B1 20050727; AT 300338 T 20050815; DE 60021444 D1 20050901; ES 2245298 T3 20060101; FR 2789472 A1 20000811; FR 2789472 B1 20010302

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050727

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050727

2011-05-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SECOMATE

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245298 T3

2005-10-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021444 P 20050901

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2005-07-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040217

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI