Global patent index - EP 1027935 A1

EP 1027935 A1 2000-08-16 - Cleaning tool

Title (en)

Cleaning tool

Title (de)

Reinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1027935 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99102495 A

Priority

EP 99102495 A

Abstract (en)

Accessory tool for use with a high-pressure cleaner for cleaning surfaces, in particular paved surfaces, having a housing (10) in which a rotor (30) comprising a laterally directed arm (32) is received. The arm is provided with an outlet nozzle (34) for ejecting high-pressure cleaning fluid. The cleaning fluid is discharged in a circular pattern to the open side of the housing towards the surface to be cleaned. The rotary coupling between the rotor (30) and the housing (10) is sealed without the use of resilient means. The inlet conduit has a narrowing extending upstream from the transition from the inlet conduit to the transit conduit in the rotor (30), causing the flow speed of the cleaning fluid at the transition to increase and the pressure of the cleaning fluid to decrease thereby reducing the sealing requirements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/06; A47L 11/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/03 (2006.01); B05B 3/06 (2006.01); B05B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/026 (2013.01); A47L 11/03 (2013.01); A47L 11/4058 (2013.01); A47L 11/4063 (2013.01); A47L 11/4088 (2013.01); B05B 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027935 A1 20000816

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041016

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040405

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI