Global Patent Index - EP 1027941 A2

EP 1027941 A2 2000-08-16 - Device for introducing lubricant into the roll gap of a hot rolling mill

Title (en)

Device for introducing lubricant into the roll gap of a hot rolling mill

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Schmierstoff in den Walzspalt eines Warm-Walzwerks

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'introduction de lubrifiant dans l'emprise d'un laminoir à chaud

Publication

EP 1027941 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125197 A

Priority

DE 19905833 A

Abstract (en)

Hot rolling mill roll gap lubricant feed equipment comprises a lubricant delivery beam pressed against a work roll (2, 3). Equipment for lubricant introduction into the roll gap (28) of a hot rolling mill (1) comprises a beam which extends parallel to the work roll axis and over its width and which is connected to a force application system for pressing the beam against the work roll (2, 3), the beam having a lubricant outlet opening facing the work roll surface. Preferred Features: The beam is in the form of a wiper (9-12) which is used to strip cooling liquid from the work roll surface and which has an opening in the form of a groove.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Schmierstoff in den Walzspalt (28) eines Warm-Walzwerks (1) mit mindestens einer Öffnung (27), aus welcher der Schmierstoff austritt. Die erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung ermöglicht es, bei verminderter Gefahr einer Qualitätseinbuße des bearbeiteten Bandes Schmierstoff in den Walzspalt eines Warm-Walzwerks einzubringen. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, daß die Öffnung (27) in die der Oberfläche einer Arbeitswalze (2,3) zugeordnete Fläche eines sich achsparallel zur Arbeitswalze (2,3) und im wesentlichen über deren Breite erstreckenden Balkens (23) eingeformt ist, der mit mindestens einer Krafterzeugungseinrichtung (16,17) verbunden ist, welche ihn gegen die Arbeitswalze (2,3) drückt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/10 (2006.01); B21B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/10 (2013.01); B21B 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027941 A2 20000816; EP 1027941 A3 20020710; DE 19905833 A1 20000824; DE 19905833 C2 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI