Global Patent Index - EP 1027942 A4

EP 1027942 A4 2001-05-16 - TUBE FOR HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME

Title (en)

TUBE FOR HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME

Title (de)

ROHR FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

TUBE POUR ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT TUBE

Publication

EP 1027942 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98931008 A

Priority

  • JP 9803059 W
  • JP 18421797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902283A1] A tube for heat exchangers, in which a band-shaped metallic plate (P) is bent and joint portions (22) provided on both ends of the plate (P) in the widthwise direction are brazed to each other. The tube has a groove (21a) extending lengthwise of the plate (P) and formed on a portion (21') where the plate (P) is to be bent. Accordingly, it is possible to correctly and easily bend the plate with the result that a brazing performance is improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/04; B21C 37/14; B21C 37/15; F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/02 (2006.01); B21C 37/14 (2006.01); B21C 37/15 (2006.01); B21D 7/00 (2006.01); B21D 53/04 (2006.01); B21D 53/08 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 1/06 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/042 (2013.01); B21C 37/14 (2013.01); B21C 37/151 (2013.01); B21D 53/04 (2013.01); B21D 53/085 (2013.01); F28D 1/0391 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 3704215 A1 19880825 - LAENGERER & REICH KUEHLER [DE]
  • [Y] DE 4340378 A1 19940601 - ZEXEL CORP [JP]
  • [A] US 5172476 A 19921222 - JOSHI SHRIKANT M [US]
  • [A] EP 0457470 A1 19911121 - SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 07 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 09 30 September 1997 (1997-09-30)
  • See also references of WO 9902283A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902283 A1 19990121; EP 1027942 A1 20000816; EP 1027942 A4 20010516; JP H1130493 A 19990202

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010622

2001-05-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 53/04 A, 7B 21C 37/15 B, 7B 21C 37/14 B, 7F 28D 1/03 B

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTROL CORPORATION

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB