Global patent index - EP 1027956 A2

EP 1027956 A2 2000-08-16 - Apparatus for finishing of substantially cylindrical workpiece surfaces

Title (en)

Apparatus for finishing of substantially cylindrical workpiece surfaces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Feinbearbeitung von im wesentlichen zylindrischen Werkstückoberflächen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le finissage de surfaces de pièces essentiellement cylindriques

Publication

EP 1027956 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101345 A

Priority

DE 19905139 A

Abstract (en)

The fine machining device has a carrier (13) to which two pressing arms (10, 11) to press grindstones (40) to the workpiece surface. The pressing arms can each be turned out by 90 degrees , which is far enough out of the horizontal region containing the workpiece for the workpiece to be transported in or out horizontally when it is changed.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine bevorzugt als Bandfinishvorrichtung ausgestaltete Vorrichtung zur Feinbearbeitung von im wesentlichen zylindrischen Werkstückoberflächen beschrieben, die einen Träger (13) hat, an dem zwei verschwenkbare Druckarme (10, 11) zum Andrücken von Feinbearbeitungsmittel (40) an die Werckstückoberfläche angebracht sind. Die Druckarme können durch Schwenkung um jeweils 90° nach außen so weit aus einem das Werkstück enthaltenden Horizontalbereich herausbewegt werden, daß ein Werkstück (12) beim Werkstückwechsel horizontal an- bzw. abtransportiert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/42; B24B 21/02; B24B 33/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 19/12 (2006.01); B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 21/004 (2013.01); B24B 5/42 (2013.01); B24B 19/12 (2013.01); B24B 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905139 A1 20000810; EP 1027956 A2 20000816; EP 1027956 A3 20010905

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050802

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040521

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 24B 5/42 A, 7B 24B 21/02 B, 7B 24B 33/04 B, 7B 24B 21/00 B, 7B 24B 5/04 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI