Global patent index - EP 1027958 A2

EP 1027958 A2 2000-08-16 - Grinder with eccentric platen

Title (en)

Grinder with eccentric platen

Title (de)

Exzenterteller-Schleifmaschine

Title (fr)

Meuleuse à plateau excentrique

Publication

EP 1027958 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101027 A

Priority

DE 19905624 A

Abstract (en)

The eccentric plate grinder machine has a grinder plate unit (8) which rotates on a pin (6) which is eccentric to the drive shaft (5) so that, in operation, the grinding plate (8) follows a circular and planetary path round the axis line (23) of the drive shaft (5). The circular movement can be overlaid by a rotary movement round the axis line (24) of the eccentric pin (6), to increase the removal of material from the workpiece. The grinding plate unit has a rim gear (12) at a rim gear (19) at a ring body (20), coaxial to the drive shaft (5), where the ring body (20) can rotate freely but is axially keyed in place. The two rim gears (12,19) are constantly meshed together. A lock (22) can prevent rotation by the ring body (20).

Abstract (de)

Eine Exzenterteller-Schleifmaschine weist eine Schleiftellereinheit (8) auf, die drehbar an einem exzentrisch an einer Antriebswelle (5) angeordneten Exzenterzapfen (6) gelagert ist, so dass die Schleiftellereinheit (8) beim Betrieb eine planetarisch um die Achslinie (23) der Antriebswelle (5) kreisende Bewegung ausführt. Dieser kreisenden Bewegung kann zum Erreichen eines erhöhten Materialabriebs am Werkstück eine Rotationsbewegung um die Achslinie (24) des Exzenterzapfens (6) überlagert werden. Hierzu trägt die Schleiftellereinheit einen Zahnkranz (12), dem ein zur Antriebswelle (5) koaxialer, von der Schleiftellereinheit gesonderter Zahnkranz (19) an einem Ringkörper (20) zugeordnet ist. Der Ringkörper (20) ist drehbar gelagert und in axialer Richtung feststehend angeordnet. Die beiden Zahnkränze (12, 19) stehen dauernd in eingriff miteinander. Mittels einer Feststelleinrichtung (22) kann der ansonsten frei drehbare Ringkörper (20) arretiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027958 A2 20000816; EP 1027958 A3 20030416; EP 1027958 B1 20040804; DE 19905624 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TTS TOOLTECHNIC SYSTEMS AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI