Global Patent Index - EP 1027960 A2

EP 1027960 A2 2000-08-16 - Device and method for disassembling connection pins

Title (en)

Device and method for disassembling connection pins

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Lösen von Verbindungsbolzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour dégager des axes de jonction

Publication

EP 1027960 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102838 A

Priority

DE 19906126 A

Abstract (en)

The tool consists of two horizontal jointed levers with facing inner end faces (11,21) and a pressure tool between the faces. The inner end face (21) of a first lever (2) has a pressure part (8), which I placed on the head of a connection bolt (18). The inner end face (11) of the seond lever (1) has a cylindrical recess, which is placed on an expander bolt (23). A extraction unit (24) extends through the recess and is connected to the end of the connection bolt.

Abstract (de)

Aufheben einer kraftschlüssigen Verbindung eines Verbindungsbolzen, wobei man zwei miteinander gelenkbeweglich gelagerte Hebel einer Einrichtung weitestgehend horizontal anordnet, deren innere Stirnflächen sich gegenüberstehen. Eine Stempeldruck-Einrichtung ist den beiden Hebeln einseitig und hebelrandseitlich (der einander zuwendenden Stirnflächenbereiche) zwischengeordnet. Am anderseitigen und hebelrandseitlich befindlichen Stirnflächenbereich eines ersten Hebels ist auf der inneren Stirnfläche ein Druckkörper positioniert. Der Druckkörper ist auf einem Bolzenkopf des Verbindungsbolzens fixiert. Der gegenüberliegende anderseitige Hebelrandbereich eines zweiten Hebels ist auf einer Spreizhülse, innerhalb derer der Verbindungsbolzen kraftschlüssig gegen die Wandung drückt, fixiert. Eine Auszugvorrichtung, die durch den anderseitigen Hebelrandbereich des zweiten Hebel geführt ist, wird dein Bolzenende des Verbindungsbolzens lösbar befestigt (verbunden). Durch die Krafteinleitung von Druckkräften FDS1, FDS2, welche die Stempeldruck-Einrichtung einzeln auf den betreffenden Hebel überträgt, und unterstützt durch eine Zugkraft, mit der die Auszugeinrichtung am Bolzenende des Verbindungsbolzens zusätzlich ansetzt, läßt sich der Verbindungsbolzen aus der kraftschlüssigen Verbindung mit der Spreizhülse lösen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/02 (2006.01); B25B 27/04 (2006.01); B25B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2013.01); B25B 27/026 (2013.01); B25B 27/04 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53896 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027960 A2 20000816; EP 1027960 A3 20030709; EP 1027960 B1 20060607; DE 19906126 A1 20000831; DE 19906126 C2 20001130; DE 50012873 D1 20060720; ES 2264655 T3 20070116; US 6336264 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-10-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH

- Effective date: 20110930

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264655 T3

2006-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012873 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25B 27/02 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25B 27/04 B

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS AIRBUS GMBH

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI