Global Patent Index - EP 1027962 A1

EP 1027962 A1 2000-08-16 - Cartridge magazine

Title (en)

Cartridge magazine

Title (de)

Kartuschenmagazin

Title (fr)

Magasin de cartouche

Publication

EP 1027962 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810050 A

Priority

DE 19905548 A

Abstract (en)

The cartridge magazine has a base part (1) and a holder part (9) with several separate holding chambers (2) for drive charges (4) and electrically ignitable ignition charges (3) arranged near the base parts closing the chambers. The base part and the holding part are each made from a non-conducting foil of one or more layers An Independent claim is also included for the use of the magazine in a firing device.

Abstract (de)

Das Kartuschenmagazin für pulverkraftbetriebene Setzgeräte weist ein dünnwandiges Bodenteil (1) und ein dünnwandiges Aufnahmeteil (9) mit mehreren Aufnahmekammern (2) auf. Diese Aufnahmekammern (2) dienen der Aufnahme einer Treibladung (4) sowie eines die Zündung der Treibladung (4) unterstützenden, elektrisch zündbaren Zündsatzes (3), der im Bereich des Bodenteiles (1) angeordnet ist. Die Zündung des Zündsatzes (3) erfolgt mit zwei das Bodenteil (1) durchstossenden, in den Zündsatz (3) ragende Elektroden (5, 6) die mit einer Stromquelle in Verbindung stehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/16; F42B 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/16 (2006.01); F42B 5/08 (2006.01); F42B 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/163 (2013.01); F42B 5/08 (2013.01); F42B 39/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027962 A1 20000816; AU 1014600 A 20000817; CA 2297646 A1 20000811; CN 1262985 A 20000816; DE 19905548 A1 20000817; JP 2000233380 A 20000829; PL 338327 A1 20000814; TW 486412 B 20020511; ZA 200000316 B 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI