Global Patent Index - EP 1027967 A1

EP 1027967 A1 2000-08-16 - Cutting device

Title (en)

Cutting device

Title (de)

Schneidvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe

Publication

EP 1027967 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101760 A

Priority

EP 99101760 A

Abstract (en)

The tool has a cutter blade (5) and elements to generate a relative pressure between the material to be cut (P) and the stationary blade. The pressure elements have a turnable roller (12) moved along the blade by drive units (7,10,11). The roller presses the material against the blade along a section only, which is shorter than the blade. It has a jacket of a material softer than that of the blade. The roller is spring-loaded against the blade. The circumferential speed of the roller exactly coincides with its advance speed along the blade.

Abstract (de)

Die Schneidvorrichtung für bahnförmiges Schneidgut, insbesondere fotografisches Kopiermaterial, umfasst eine feststehende Schneide (5) und ein längs der Schneide beweglich geführtes Anpressorgan (12) sowie Antriebsmittel (7,10,11) zum Bewegen des Anpressorgans längs der Schneide. Das Anpressorgan (12) presst auf seinem Weg längs der Schneide (5) das auf der Schneide aufliegende Schneidgut (P) jeweils nur in einem gegenüber der Länge der Schneide (5) vergleichsweise kurzen Andruckbereich gegen die Schneide (5) und trennt das Schneidgut durch Quetschung. Der erforderliche Kräfteaufwand beschränkt sich dadurch auf die Bewegung des Anpressorgans (12) längs der Schneide (5) und ist wesentlich geringer als bei herkömmlichen Schneidvorrichtungen dieser Art. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/20; B26D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/02 (2006.01); B26D 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/025 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027967 A1 20000816; CA 2292118 A1 20000811

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-08 [R11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

- Effective date: 20021022

2004-04-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-11 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20021022 CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI