Global patent index - EP 1027971 A1

EP 1027971 A1 2000-08-16 - automatic system for manufacturing standard and special bricks, floor tiles, plain roofing tiles and other tiling of any shape by using very moist clay to form parts having a shape similar to hand-manufactured products

Title (en)

automatic system for manufacturing standard and special bricks, floor tiles, plain roofing tiles and other tiling of any shape by using very moist clay to form parts having a shape similar to hand-manufactured products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von genormten und speziellen Handformsteinen , Handformfussbodenfliessen , Handformbiberschwanzdachziegeln und Handformfliesenelementen aller Formen aus feuchtem Ton

Title (fr)

Dispositif automatique pour la fabrication de briques normales ou spéciales , de carreaux , de tuiles et d'éléments de carrelage de toutes formes semblables à des produits fabriqués à la main à partir d'argile humide

Publication

EP 1027971 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98106179 A

Priority

IT SI970001 U

Abstract (en)

An automatic system for manufacturing standard and special bricks, floor tiles, plain roofing tiles and other tiling components of any shape comprises: a moist clay mixer (2); a part forming machine (3); a station (4) for supporting a mold holder (5) provided with means for fixing at least one mold, the station being arranged below the forming machine; a unit (6) for the wire cutting of the formed parts; and a transfer line for the mold holder (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 5/04; B28B 7/00; B28B 7/08; B28B 7/38; B28B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 5/04 (2006.01); B28B 7/38 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/386 (2013.01); B28B 5/04 (2013.01); B28B 13/0205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027971 A1 20000816; IT SI970001 U1 19970707; IT SI970001 V0 19970408

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT PT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI